+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
- Committee of the Whole:
- Motion to amend 1
- Motion to amend 1
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to ENV - Gallego
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to ENV - Ableser
- Amendment passed: ENV
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Environment: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Environment
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Environment - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Environment - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2011: Environment: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1