+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 173
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Judiciary: Do pass
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment substituted: JUD
- Amendment passed: SUB Floor Amend to JUD - Kavanagh
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Kavanagh SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the JUDICIARY Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Kavanagh SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the JUDICIARY Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
3-17 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 22, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
March 17, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 13, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 4
February 3, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 3, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor