+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 122
- Action: Signed
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Barto flr amend (ref HMLR)
- Amendment adopted: HMLR (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Senate first read
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment passed: HHS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- House first read
+ − Amendments (14)
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref HMLR) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
4-16 hmlr_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
3-19 hmlr_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Barto flr amend (ref HMLR) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 28, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2012: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
February 29, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 5
January 18, 2012: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 18, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor