+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 145
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Amendment:
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: JUD
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (6)
July 1, 2009: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 20
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
June 15, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 8
February 12, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 12, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor