+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 127
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: ED - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to ED - Leach
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to ED - Meyer
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to ED - Leach - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2015: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 24, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 7
January 27, 2015: Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
January 27, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor