+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 121
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 10, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2530jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 6
June 12, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
June 10, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2009: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8