+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 28, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 28, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor