+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 267
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HMLR (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: HHS
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to HHS - Yee
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (13)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Yee Floor Amendment; reference to the Health and Human Services Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 7
April 12, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2011: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
February 28, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2011: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor