+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 218
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Yarbrough flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GHE
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Government and Higher Education
House Proposed Amendment
Yarbrough flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government and Higher Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 1, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 31, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 3, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 29, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor