+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 96
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Farley flr amend (ref Bill)
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Senator Hobbs to include the Farley flr amend
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: FI
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - McCune Davis
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Clinco
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Financial Institutions: Do pass amended
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Financial Institutions
House Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions
House Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions
House Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions
House Adopted Amendment
3-17 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2014: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 27, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
January 30, 2014: Financial Institutions: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 30, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor