+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 61
- Action: Signed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Worsley flr amend (ref CEM)
- Amendment adopted: CEM (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Senate first read
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:14 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Worsley flr amend (ref CEM) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Worsley flr amend (ref CEM) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-1 cem_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 4, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 8
March 28, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 28, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2013: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 5, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor