+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (10)
May 5, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
May 5, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 3, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
January 27, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
January 27, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
January 27, 2016: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
January 27, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor