+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
- House adopted conference committee report.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted conference committee report.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- House caucus on conference committee report.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Conference committee recommendation: That the House accept the Senate amendments and the bill be further amended.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate caucus on conference committee report.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate members appointed to conference committee: BARTO, LESKO, PANCRAZI
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- House members appointed to conference committee: ALLEN J, LOVAS, MCCUNE DAVIS
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- CFA - passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Children and Family Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Children and Family Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (8)
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Children and Family Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Children and Family Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (14)
May 7, 2016: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
May 7, 2016: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 5
May 6, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 5
April 12, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
April 12, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
March 1, 2016: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 1, 2016: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 24, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 10
February 24, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 25, 2016: House Children and Family Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 25, 2016: Children and Family Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1