+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Worsley flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to suspend a portion of Senate Rule 8A-3 for the purpose of returning House Bill 2521 to the calendar of the Committee of the Whole. Motion carried.: Passed
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:08PM.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to bill - John - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:11PM.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
- Second read in House.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 11, 2018: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 58
April 4, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 28, 2018: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 22, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
February 6, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 6, 2018: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor