+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 28, 2019: House Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
January 28, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor