+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 52
- Action: Signed
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:42 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
+ − Amendment
3-17 health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
March 10, 2008: Health: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2008: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
January 29, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1