+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Carter
- Final disposition: Substituted Senate bill on third reading
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Health: Do pass
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Carter - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2015: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
January 27, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor