+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
- House concurred.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 7, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 5
May 7, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 14
March 30, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
February 23, 2016: Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 23, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2016: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor