+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 46
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 12:15 pm
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:00 am
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-13 health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 4, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2007: Health: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2007: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
January 24, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor