+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 245 e
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Driggs flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment withdrawn: JUD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 1, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 31, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 26, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (78)
Type:
Primary Sponsor