+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Smith flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Petersen - passed
- SUB Floor Amend to Petersen Floor Amend - Mach - failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
Smith flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Petersen - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 23, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 23, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
January 25, 2016: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor