+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 316
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:45 amobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 4:29 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Education: Do pass
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2015: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 9, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2015: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
January 28, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor