+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education Accountability and Reform
- Senate first read
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Crandall #2
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Boone
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Crandall #1
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to ED - Crandall
- Amendment: ED
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Rep. court moved to amend the committee of the whole report to show that hb 2516 be retained on calendar. motion passed.
- Amendment: ED - passed (Bill retained on Calendar by amending the Committee of the Whole report)
- COW motion
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 13, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Crandall Substitute Floor amendment to the Education Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Crandall Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Crandall Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Boone Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Crandall Substitute Floor amendment to the Education Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Boone Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Crandall Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Crandall Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 16, 2009: Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 9
February 11, 2009: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 11, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor