+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
4-2 strikermemo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-27 health strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
3-30 approp strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 19, 2007: Health: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2007: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 24, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor