+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 268
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: H
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Barto flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref PS)
- Amendment adopted: PS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended with recommendation for a floor amendment
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass amended
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Senate first read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: SUB Floor Amend to JUD - Mesnard
- Amendment substituted: JUD
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (15)
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Mesnard SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the JUDICIARY Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Mesnard SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the JUDICIARY Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
4-21 ps_aspassedcow
Senate Fact Sheet
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 23, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
April 21, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 7
March 13, 2014: Public Safety: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor