+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 2, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 276
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On June 21, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On June 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Cheuvront flr amend (ref FIN)
- Amendment failed: Tibshraeny flr amend #1 (ref FIN) (sub Cheuvront)
- Amendment failed: Tibshraeny flr amend #2 (ref FIN) (sub Cheuvront)
- Amendment failed: Rios flr amend #1 (ref FIN) (sub Cheuvront)
- Amendment failed: Rios flr amend #2 (ref FIN) (sub Cheuvront)
- Amendment:
- COW motion
- Senator tibshraeny to exclude the cheuvront flr amendment and include the tibshraeny flr amendment # 1
- COW motion
- Senator tibshraeny to include the tibshraeny #2 and exclude the cheuvront flr amendment
- COW motion
- Senator rios to include the rios #2 and exclude the cheuvront flr amendment
- Third read: Passed
On June 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Finance
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: HEALTH
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
Cheuvront Floor Amendment, reference to FIN amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Cheuvront Floor Amendment, reference to FIN amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-22 strikermemo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Health
House Adopted Amendment
6-20 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
3-19 fin strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
June 20, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 3
June 19, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
March 14, 2007: Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 6, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
January 24, 2007: Health: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
January 24, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10