+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth - passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 11:12AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 9, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 28, 2017: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 22, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 24
February 9, 2017: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 9, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor