+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to bill - Benally - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 8:55AM.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2018: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 28, 2018: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 22, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 20
February 6, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 6, 2018: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor