+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in committee of whole
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 1:45 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- House first read
+ − Votes (2)
February 12, 2009: Banking and Insurance: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 12, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8