+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 3
January 30, 2014: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 30, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor