+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- GHE - passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
Government and Higher Education
House Proposed Amendment
Government and Higher Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 23, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
February 23, 2016: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 18
January 25, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 25, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6