+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: held.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 16
February 9, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 9, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9