+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 8:55AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 6, 2018: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 6, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor