+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-21 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2014: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 16
March 17, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 17, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 4
January 30, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 30, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor