+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Failed to pass
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Townsend
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:03 pmobject
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Townsend - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2015: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 25, 2015: Judiciary: Failed to pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 4
February 24, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 23
February 2, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 2, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor