+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 38
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:29 pm
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-27 jud-trans
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 9, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 25, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2014: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
February 24, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 28, 2014: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor