+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 19, 2023 in the House:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On June 12, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On June 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (7)
June 12, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 13, 2023: Senate Finance and Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2023: Senate Finance & Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2023: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
January 19, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 19, 2023: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor