+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- HEALTH - passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (5)
Health
House Proposed Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 7, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 14
May 7, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 5
April 25, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
April 25, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2016: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
March 9, 2016: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 29, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 29, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2016: Health: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
January 27, 2016: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 27, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor