+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Cook - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 8:55AM.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 29, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 28, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
February 6, 2018: House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 6, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6