+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Withdrawn
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- House first read
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 5, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 5, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor