+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Financial Institutions Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Livingston #1 - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Insurance Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Insurance Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to Bill - Livingston #1 - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 7
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 7
January 28, 2016: House Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 28, 2016: Insurance: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor