+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 229
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment withdrawn: ED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Crandell flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Third read: Passed
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (19)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandell flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
June 13, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 13, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2013: Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2013: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
January 30, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 30, 2013: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor