+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Livingston - passed
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 9, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 28, 2017: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
February 14, 2017: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
February 14, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor