+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- NREW (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass amended.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to bill - Descheenie - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 8:55AM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
May 3, 2018: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
April 9, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
February 28, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2018: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 22, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 11
January 30, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 30, 2018: House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor