+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- WM
- SUB Floor Amend to WM - Mitchell - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (5)
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
SUB Floor Amend to WM - Mitchell - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor