+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 10, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 91
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Veterans and Military Affairs: Do pass
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Veterans and Military Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 18, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Education: Withdrawn
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2495vma
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 6
June 19, 2009: Veterans and Military Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 18, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 11
February 10, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor