+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Education (K-12): Withdrawn
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Water and Agriculture: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in rules
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Water and Agriculture
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Water and Agriculture - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Water and Agriculture - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Water and Agriculture - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Water and Agriculture - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
January 23, 2007: Water and Agriculture: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor