+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- JUD (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 11:12AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 10, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 20
April 5, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 7
March 14, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 22, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 8, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 8, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor