+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Bolding - passed
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
- House Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 20, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 6, 2019: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 4, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 4, 2019: House Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 4, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 4, 2019: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 6