+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Tobin
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:00 pmobject
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Tobin Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Tobin Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 17, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
January 25, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 25, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor